Cohen, Nicole Francine (CPSO#: 89453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-3552
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Cohen ( CPSO# 89453 )
Dr. M. Cohen ( CPSO# 55982 )

Business Address:
9 - 5925 Grossbeak Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 6S5
Phone Number: (905) 824-2467

Business Address:
2 - 6981 Milcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8
Phone Number: (289) 724-7246

Business Address:
2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Phone Number: (905) 885-1860


Corporation Name: Nicole Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Cohen ( CPSO# 89453 )

Business Address:
Valley House
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-3552

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE FRANCINE COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 06 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jul 2009 to 06 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jul 2010 to 06 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jul 2011 to 06 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013