Cohen, Susan Barbara (CPSO#: 54475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Metro Children's Aid
20 DeBoers
Unit 250
Toronto ON  M3J 0H1
Phone: (416) 924-4640 Ext. 3415
Fax: (416) 324-2371
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cohen and Levin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cohen ( CPSO# 54475 )
Dr. L. Levin ( CPSO# 50931 )

Business Address:
30 Isabella Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1N1
Phone Number: (416) 924-4640

Business Address:
250 - 20 DeBoers Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 0H1
Phone Number: (416) 924-4640

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7411

Business Address:
207 - 5293 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 471-7787

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
12th Floor
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN BARBARA COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Research Fellows - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1985