Cohen-Kerem, Raanan (CPSO#: 77280)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2004