Cohen-Silver, Justine Heather (CPSO#: 89205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
410 sherbourne health center
Toronto ON  M5A2K3
Phone: 416-867-3728
Fax: 416-867-3726
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

78 Seaforth Avenue
Parkdale Public School
St Joseph Health Center
Medical Clinic
Toronto ON  M6K3L2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Hospital for Sick children-Dept
of Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-813-5807
Fax: 416-813-7038
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Just for Kids Clinic,St. Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTINE HEATHER COHEN-SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN-SILVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 10 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2013