Cohn, Adam (CPSO#: 77695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hsopital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4842
Fax: (613) 721-4785
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 120
1130 Morrison Dr
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Canada
Phone: (613) 820-5050
Fax: (613) 820-7831
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Cohn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cohn ( CPSO# 77695 )

Business Address:
Suite 120
1130 Morrison Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone Number: (613) 820-5050

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4842

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM COHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2006