Colapinto, David Andrew (CPSO#: 85819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kigezi International School of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-481-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

47 Liberty St
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Colapinto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Colapinto ( CPSO# 85819 )

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW COLAPINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLAPINTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009