Cole, Eric Brian (CPSO#: 93772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 875-3920
Fax: (905) 875-4340
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crystal Fong & Eric Cole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fong ( CPSO# 93560 )
Dr. E. Cole ( CPSO# 93772 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6188

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC BRIAN COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015