Collings, Darryl Edward (CPSO#: 93190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 102
1 First Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1A1
Phone: (705) 446-1845
Fax: (705) 446-1897
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Collings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Collings ( CPSO# 93190 )

Business Address:
102 - 1 First Street
Collingwood ON  L9L 1A1
Phone Number: (705) 446-1845

Business Address:
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
1112 St Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARRYL EDWARD COLLINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINGS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015