Collins, Alexandra Katharina Ursula (CPSO#: 60556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Feb 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Apr 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Cook Street
Meaford ON  N4L 1N2
Phone: (519) 538-5282
Fax: (519) 538-2602
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandra K. Collins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Collins ( CPSO# 60556 )

Business Address:
89 Cook Street
Meaford ON  N4L 1N2
Phone Number: (519) 538-5282

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 02 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Nov 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 6, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Alexandra Katharina
            Ursula Collins, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Collins to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. ALEXANDRA KATHARINA URSULA COLLINS
                                          ("Dr. Collins")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Collins, certificate of registration number 60556, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Collins, further acknowledge that the ICR Committee directed that
                  I complete a specified continuing education or remediation program (the
                  "Program") on or around January 27, 2016 with respect to my emergency
                  medicine practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Collins, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Collins, undertake that, effective immediately, my practice
                        will be restricted to family medicine.  I may not practice
                        emergency medicine.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Collins, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Collins, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Collins, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Dr. Collins was subject to a specified continuing education or
                        remediation program relating to her emergency medicine practice,
                        the components of which were not completed.  Dr. Collins has agreed
                        not to practise emergency medicine.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Collins, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Collins, give my irrevocable consent to any Chiefs of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 6, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Alexandra Katharina Ursula Collins to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 6, 2018:

Dr. Collins was subject to a specified continuing education or remediation program relating to her emergency medicine practice, the components of which were not completed. Dr. Collins has agreed not to practise emergency medicine.