Collins, Brett George (CPSO#: 94286)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2010 to 24 Oct 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2011