Collins, Carola Johanna Dorette (CPSO#: 88753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Vanderspek, Carola Johanna Dorette (used until: 10 Aug 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
715180 Oxford Road 4
Woodstock ON  N4S 7V9
Phone: (519) 537-8515 Ext. 5
Fax: (519) 421-1057
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carola Collins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Collins ( CPSO# 88753 )

Business Address:
715180 Oxford Road 4
Woodstock ON  N4S 7V9
Phone Number: (519) 537-8515

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLA JOHANNA DORETTE COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010