Collins, Melissa Ann (CPSO#: 94758)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Jan 2011 to 13 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2011 to 25 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Nov 2011