Collins, Rhonda Lynn (CPSO#: 86658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Revera Inc.
5015 Spectrum Way
Suite 600
Mississauga ON  L4W 0E4
Phone: 289-719-3210
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rhonda Collins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Collins ( CPSO# 86658 )

Business Address:
Revera Inc.
600-5015 Spectrum Way
Mississauga ON  L4W 0E4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RHONDA LYNN COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009