Colter, Ashley Lind (CPSO#: 97899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305 - 1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 445-4111
Fax: (705) 445-8250
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Colter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Colter ( CPSO# 97899 )

Business Address:
240 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 0X8
Phone Number: (705) 444-2555

Business Address:
1 Huron Street
Suite 305
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone Number: (705) 445-4111

Business Address:
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2250

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEY LIND COLTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 15 Dec 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015