Comisarow, Richard Harold (CPSO#: 23370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 416 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. H. Comisarow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Comisarow ( CPSO# 23370 )

Business Address:
Suite 404
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 256-7433

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 23 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 23, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Richard Harold
            Comisarow in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Comisarow
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. RICHARD HAROLD COMISAROW
                                          ("Dr. Comisarow")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Comisarow, certificate of registration number 23370, am a member
                  of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Comisarow, acknowledge that the College investigated a complaint
                  bearing File Number 107004 (the "Investigation") into my standard of
                  practice and conduct in my urology practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Comisarow, acknowledge that I fully retired from my urology
                  practice in Ontario on January 1, 2018, and have not since that date
                  engaged in the practice of urology in any capacity. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Comisarow, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately. 

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Comisarow, undertake that I will not engage in the practice
                        of urology.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 
                  
                  (a)   I, Dr. Comisarow, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Comisarow, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Comisarow, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Comisarow, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and Appendix "B",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Comisarow, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Comisarow, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Comisarow, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Comisarow, acknowledge that the College may provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Comisarow, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Comisarow, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Comisarow, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Comisarow, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College conducted an investigation into Dr. Comisarow's
                              standard of practice and conduct in his practice of urology.
                              Dr. Comisarow has since retired from the practice of urology
                              and agreed not to engage in the practice of urology.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Comisarow, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Richard Harold Comisarow to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 23, 2018:

The College conducted an investigation into Dr. Comisarow's standard of practice and conduct in his practice of urology. Dr. Comisarow has since retired from the practice of urology and agreed not to engage in the practice of urology.