Comley, Andrew Spencer (CPSO#: 79797)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Adelaide, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Aug 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004