Commons, Amiya Susan (CPSO#: 55844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIYA SUSAN COMMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMMONS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1988