Compeyrot, Sandrine Sabine (CPSO#: 78289)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bordeaux, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 May 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007