Comstock, Ravneet Kaur Bedi (CPSO#: 73742)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: Bedi, Ravneet Kaur (used until: 14 Feb 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Apr 2004