Cong, Quynh Huong (CPSO#: 87491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 27 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QUYNH HUONG CONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 26 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2018