Conlin, Anne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 83204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
Lower Level
824 Clonsilla Avenue
Peterborough ON  K9J 5Y3
Phone: (705) 745-7607
Fax: (705) 745-8679
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Conlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Conlin ( CPSO# 83204 )

Business Address:
824 Clonsilla Avenue
Lower Level
Unit 2
Peterborough ON  K9J 5Y3
Phone Number: (705) 745-7607

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE ELIZABETH CONLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011