Conneely, John Barry Mark (CPSO#: 96731)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2014