Connelly, Brendan Bernard (CPSO#: 77459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
832 March Road
Kanata ON  K2W 0C9
Phone: (613) 599-5599
Fax: (613) 599-1005
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Connelly Krupa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Krupa ( CPSO# 77467 )
Dr. B. Connelly ( CPSO# 77459 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
832 March Road
Kanata ON  K2W 0C9
Phone Number: (613) 599-5599

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDAN BERNARD CONNELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNELLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004