Connelly, Kim Alexander (CPSO#: 85503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5263
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Connelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Connelly ( CPSO# 85503 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 518-1570

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Apr 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Kim Alexander Connelly may practise medicine independently in cardiology.