Connolly, Colleen Marie (CPSO#: 93521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton, ON L8V 5C2
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 575-2645
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLLEEN MARIE CONNOLLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNOLLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2015