Connolly, Katherine (CPSO#: 96414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
David Braley Research Institute
30 Birge St, C3-204
Hamilton, ON
L8L 0A6
Toronto ON  M5C 2C4
Phone: 905-527-4322 Ext. 40317
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 31 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE CONNOLLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNOLLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Oct 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015