Connors, Lori Ann (CPSO#: 87166)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 02 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2007 to 27 Jul 2007
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 03 Sep 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2008 to 14 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2009 to 14 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011