Contreras Dominguez, Vladimir (CPSO#: 84094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Universidad La Salle Escuela, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
Room D105
1053 Carling Ave.
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-5164
Fax: (613) 761-4036
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

40 Ruskin
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Nov 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2006 to 09 May 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 May 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2008 to 16 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Vladimir  Contreras  Dominguez  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            internal medicine.