Conway, Jennifer Lynn (CPSO#: 83739)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2005 to 23 Oct 2005
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2006 to 29 Jan 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 29 Dec 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2014