Conway-Hicks, Siobhan Ann Balfour (CPSO#: 97089)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: Nunez, Siobhan Ann Balfour (used until: 21 Aug 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2014