Cook, David John (CPSO#: 30464)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Norwegian

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 2293 Alder St Kingston ON K7L 4V1
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018