Cook, Sarah Jane (CPSO#: 82739)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Mar 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 09 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2007 to 21 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009