Cook, Sonya Maureen (CPSO#: 77920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Compass Dermatology
Unit 8
650 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N5
Phone: (647) 351-9277
Fax: (647) 351-9077
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonya Cook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cook ( CPSO# 77920 )

Business Address:
Compass Dermatology
Unit 8
650 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N5
Phone Number: (647) 351-9277

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 10 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONYA MAUREEN COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009