Cooke, Theodore Derek Vernon (CPSO#: 21945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
99C Dufferin Street
Perth ON  K7H 3A5
Phone: (613) 264-0707
Fax: (613) 264-0641
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Cooke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cooke ( CPSO# 21945 )

Business Address:
Unit 1
99C Dufferin Street
Perth ON  K7H 3A5
Phone Number: (613) 264-0707

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request to: derek@cookes.ca or via mail to: RR# 3 271 Mica Point Rd Maberly, ON K0H 2B0 or contact Dr.Cooke via 613 - 279 - 1217
Date Received: 31 Jul 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODORE DEREK VERNON COOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1969