Cookson, Christina Anne (CPSO#: 98068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Byron Family Medical Centre
1228 Commissioners Rd W
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone: (519) 472-9670
Fax: (519) 657-1766
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Doctors Walk-In Clinic
641 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6C 2T9
Canada
Phone: (519) 686-8585
Fax: (519) 686-8580
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christina Cookson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cookson ( CPSO# 98068 )

Business Address:
Doctors Walk-In Clinic
641 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2T9
Phone Number: (519) 686-8585

Business Address:
1228 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone Number: (519) 472-9670

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA ANNE COOKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOKSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014