Coolican, Paul Juler (CPSO#: 59097)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Coolican Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: St. Lawrence Medical Clinic Suite 100 34 Ottawa Street Morrisburg ON K0C 1X0
Date Received: 08 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018