Cooney, Paul Ronald Howard (CPSO#: 93059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 722-0516
Fax: (705) 722-0814
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Cooney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cooney ( CPSO# 93059 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 722-0516

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL RONALD HOWARD COONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COONEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012