Cooper, Kenneth Jeffery (CPSO#: 66213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH JEFFERY COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2018