Copeland, Laura Lee (CPSO#: 90310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Mar 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ohio State University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 82252
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit C2
180 Sudbury Street
Toronto ON  M6J 0A8
Canada
Phone: 647-524-6216
Fax: 855-344-9519
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 24 Mar 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Laura Lee Copeland may practise: 

                  (i)   medicine independently in emergency medicine;
                  
                  AND
                  
                  (ii)  Medical Psychotherapy at The Centre for Mindfulness Studies and Get
                        Well   Clinic   in   Toronto,   Ontario,  while  under  supervision
                        coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and
                  
            2.    The authority to practice in clause 1(ii)  automatically expires upon the
                  following   events,   unless  the  Registration  Committee   renews   the
                  certificate with or without  additional  or  other  terms, conditions and
                  limitations:
                  
                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Copeland's  knowledge,  skill,  judgement  or  attitude,  does  not
                        provide  the  required reports to the College by the due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Copeland's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) Dr.  Copeland is no longer enrolled in the Change of Scope Program,
                        or
                  
                  (iv)  the College  finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Copeland's practice unsatisfactory.