Copeland, Roarke Harold (CPSO#: 109880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South East Toronto
Family Health Team
840 Coxwell Ave
East York ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROARKE HAROLD COPELAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COPELAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018