Coppolino, Michael Leo (CPSO#: 61261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2425 Geary Boulevard
San Francisco CA  94115
United States

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LEO COPPOLINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COPPOLINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018