Corbeil, Chantal Paula (CPSO#: 81189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Eastern Ontario
Health Centre For Kids
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 1848
Fax: (705) 523-8232
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chantal Corbeil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Corbeil ( CPSO# 81189 )

Business Address:
North Eastern Onatrio
Health Centre for Kids
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANTAL PAULA CORBEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORBEIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2010