Cordovani, Ligia de Almeida Ferreira (CPSO#: 94650)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Cordovani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cordovani ( CPSO# 94650 )
Dr. D. Cordovani ( CPSO# 93332 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Suite HSC-2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
3rd Floor
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 15 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2013