Corpus, Todd Roland (CPSO#: 81406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Loma Linda Univ School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
4580 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y2
Phone: (416) 739-9123
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

279 Kingston Road East
Unit 18
Ajax ON  L1Z 0K5
Canada
Phone: (905) 619-2278
Fax: (905) 239-2403
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TODD ROLAND CORPUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORPUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006