Correa-Bulnes, Raimundo (CPSO#: 92001)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad De Los Andes (Chile), 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Aug 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Apr 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011