Correia, Adriano Jose (CPSO#: 84646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 509
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 828-6777
Fax: (905) 828-6770
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sheridan Centre
Unit 183
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Canada
Phone: (905) 823-0223
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adriano J Correia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Correia ( CPSO# 84646 )

Business Address:
183 - 2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 823-0223

Business Address:
Unit 509
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 828-6777

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANO JOSE CORREIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORREIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010