Correia, Jason Daniel (CPSO#: 81004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (905) 333-6245
Fax: (905) 333-6266
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Correia & Sarah Bacopulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Correia ( CPSO# 81004 )
Dr. S. Bacopulos ( CPSO# 80760 )

Business Address:
Suite 106
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 333-6245

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON DANIEL CORREIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORREIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009