Corriveau, Sophie Lynne (CPSO#: 95465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Room 405- McMaster Clinics
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905)527-0271 Ext. 44548
Fax: (905)577-1475
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Feb 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIE LYNNE CORRIVEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORRIVEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 27 Jul 2018
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015