Cosma, Rodica (CPSO#: 75241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
K-W Walk-In Clinic
100 The Boardwalk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B1
Phone: 519-279-4098
Fax: 519-279-4099
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Westmount Place Walk in Clinic
50 Westmount Rd. N
Waterloo ON  N2L 6N9
Canada
Phone: 519 -954-0111
Fax: 519-954-0112
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Cosma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 2 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RODICA COSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2003