Coso, Diane (CPSO#: 74536)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Aix-Marseille II, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 20 Oct 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2000